ST PETERS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS & FRIENDS ASSOCIATION(SITTINGBOURNE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FIESTA ON THE FIELD ANNUAL SUMMER FETE BREAKFAST WITH SANTA DISCO SPORTS DAY TEA TENT RAFFLES QUIZ NIGHTS SCHOOL UNIFORM NEW AND SECOND HAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 03 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Cork | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL STREATFIELD | Trustee | 03 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £1.70k | £438 | £2.56k | £3.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.48k | £2.76k | £2.87k | £2.11k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 7 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF ST PETERS RC SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Langley Road
Sittingbourne
ME10 2EH
- Phone:
- 01795 423479
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window