DRAGON BANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dragon Bands supports young people through music-offering guitar/drum lessons-radio training-PA-studio. We also offer practice rooms and are in the process of running our own magazine. We are situated in one of Torfaen's deprived areas. We also run an internet radio station(FLAME), Recording Studio (ROC_IT).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 22 December 2004: Standard registration
- 04 October 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 April 2014: Re-registered
- 10 November 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.54k | £37.02k | £20.04k | £24.35k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.50k | £57.66k | £16.15k | £28.14k | £30.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 May 2014 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 10 March 2014 | 38 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ART AND CULTURE OF MUSIC, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WALES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window