Financial history DROLMA MAHAYANA BUDDHIST CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1107477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £60.59k £51.26k £39.32k £35.43k £36.91k
Total expenditure £46.50k £36.64k £26.72k £28.60k £40.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A