DROLMA MAHAYANA BUDDHIST CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Buddhist Centre with a small number of residents. We offer weekly meditation courses, day courses, retreats in the New Kadampa Tradition of Mahayana Buddhism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 05 January 2005: Standard registration
- DROLMA BUDDHIST CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Frascella | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Helena Jarman | Trustee | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JENNIFER ANDREWS | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.59k | £51.26k | £39.32k | £35.43k | £36.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.50k | £36.64k | £26.72k | £28.60k | £40.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 20 Dec 2020 as amended on 08 Jan 2021 as amended on 20 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity (“the Objects”) are to promote the Buddhist Faith under the spiritual guidance of the elected General Spiritual Director of the New Kadampa Tradition - International Kadampa Buddhist Union principally through the activities of teaching, study, practice and the observance of moral discipline all within the Mahayana Buddhist tradition of Atisha and Je Tsongkhapa as taught by Venerable Geshe Kelsang Gyatso, the Founder of the New Kadampa Tradition - International Kadampa Buddhist Union, through the continuous implementation of the three New Kadampa Tradition Study Programmes: the General Programme, the Foundation Programme, and the Teacher Training Programme, all as defined in Schedule A of this Memorandum
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Drolma Mahayana Buddhist Centre
260 Dogsthorpe Road
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 3PG
- Phone:
- 01733755444
- Email:
- info@drolmacentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window