TLA CREATIVE MULTIMEDIA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES SERVICES PROVIDES HUMAN RESOURCES MAKES GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cyprus
Governance
- 17 December 2004: Standard registration
- 28 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TLA CREATIVE MULTIMEDIA LIMITED (Working name)
- TLA-CMM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.17k | £28.90k | £20.91k | £28.04k | £35.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.90k | £29.86k | £29.50k | £26.44k | £34.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 January 2022 | 91 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2022 | 456 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2022 | 456 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 24 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window