Accounts and annual returns TOWNLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1107326
Charity reporting is up to date (128 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 November 2024 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required