Accounts and annual returns JAWAD MUHAMMAD SHAIBANI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1107371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 09 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 March 2011 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 14 October 2009 On Time