Financial history INSPIRE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1107820
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.34m £5.68m £5.14m £4.42m £4.53m
Total expenditure £3.27m £5.47m £4.77m £4.58m £4.30m
Income from government contracts £3.31m £3.35m £2.03m £4.34m £3.30m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £36.06k £0 £0 £1.06k £11.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.27m £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.31m £3.79m £5.06m £4.42m £4.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.61k £2.03k £1.38k £7.10k £99.33k
Income - Other £16.40k £702.74k £85.11k £0 £7
Income - Legacies £36.06k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.27m £5.47m £4.77m £4.58m £4.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £28.39k £35.06k £63.47k £0 £111.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0