THE TRANSVERSE MYELITIS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Transverse Myelitis Society provides information and support to over 2000 TM sufferers, carers and families in UK. The TMS also supports people with other rare auto-immune neurological conditions eg ADEM and NMO. TM support groups are active throughout UK www.myelitis.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Elizabeth Cabraal | Trustee | 26 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROB REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEWIS HYDE GRAY | Trustee |
|
||||||
SALLY RODOHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.57k | £17.87k | £24.61k | £17.45k | £16.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.91k | £10.15k | £18.65k | £12.50k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 12 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM TRANSVERSE MYELITIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE, BY RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONS OF TRANSVERSE MYELITIS AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 AVENUE ROAD
BRENTFORD
TW8 9NS
- Phone:
- 02085680350
- Email:
- lewgray@myelitis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window