COLE ANDERSON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING AWARDING BURSARIES GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO STUDENTS PURSUING ACADEMIC STUDIES IN MEDICINE ARCHITECTURE AND MUSIC 2)RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN BOURNEMOUTH AND POOLE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARC DE MARCO Trustee 05 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £690 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £690 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 June 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 February 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rawlins Davy
35 Richmond Hill
BOURNEMOUTH
BH2 6HT
Phone:
01202558844
Email:
No information available
Website:

none.available