TRUE CHRISTIAN BIBLE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities Education & Training Relief of Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEACONESS MARTHA DANIELS | Trustee | 18 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev PRINCE DANIELS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH WILBERFORCE BOADI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.41k | £4.88k | £7.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £6.01k | £7.06k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 October 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS WITH THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR RURAL AREAS OF THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES, BY FACILITATING COMMUNITY AGRICULTURE AND PROVIDING TOOLS, EQUIPMENT, CLOTHING, FOOD AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THOSE IN NEED. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN A RANGE OF SKILL AREAS. 4. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION, PARTICULAR IN RURAL AREAS OF THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES, OF FREE OR SUBSIDISED HOSPITALS AND MOBILE CLINICS FOR THOSE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD OR ACCESS MEDICAL TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Manor Square
DAGENHAM
RM8 3SA
- Phone:
- 02085175112
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window