THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY CHURCH FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of religion and such other purposes as are charitable. The aim of the charity is to support the activities of the International Community Church, its missions in the UK and overseas, education and outreach programmes. The objective is to provide charitable support and education to the needy and spread the understanding of the Christian Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 March 2005: Standard registration
- ICCF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Jean Guikema | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Skube | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair John Offor | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Jones Hatchett IV | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
HUGH COLIN STEPHEN McLEAN | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399.65k | £440.11k | £516.88k | £342.90k | £235.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £429.66k | £430.51k | £387.74k | £418.72k | £236.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £516.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £46 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £54 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £387.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £645 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £384.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY CHURCH
c/o 50 WAVERLEY ROAD
OXSHOTT
SURREY
KT22 0RZ
- Phone:
- 07948711150
- Email:
- churchoffice@icc-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window