HENHAM STEAM RALLY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by increasing knowledge of and interest in historical mechanically propelled vehicles including traction engine, steam rollers and other steam vehicles and other historical machinery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 December 2004: Standard registration
- HENHAM STEAM RALLY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell William Gant | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|||||
PETER SMALL | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
RONALD CARTER | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
ALAN HARDWICK | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Ryan James Baker | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN ROBERT GILES CRISP | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|||||
MR RAY MILLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM ALFRED SCRIVEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
GERARD ALBERT WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.88k | £1.39k | £18 | £195.27k | £193.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.18k | £4.23k | £6.16k | £283.23k | £184.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE OF AND INTEREST IN HISTORICAL MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES INCLUDING ( BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TRACTION ENGINE, STEAMROLLERS AND OTHER STEAM VEHICLES; OTHER HISTORIC MACHINERY INCLUDING ( BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FAIR ORGANS, FAIRGROUND AND SHOWMAN'S EQUIPMENT AND AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT, HISTORIC CRAFTS AND CRAFTSMANSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Southwold Road
Wrentham
Beccles
NR34 7JE
- Phone:
- 01502675222
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window