THE JINJA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports children at a number of schools and orphanages in Jinja, including Mama Jane's,Valley View, Great Hopes, Son Rise and Lake Victoria, through the sponsorship of children to attend school and by implementing projects such as the building of classrooms, installation of new water tanks and new playground equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 January 2005: Standard registration
- THE BUJAGALI TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jon Symonds | Chair | 01 June 2011 | ||||||
Smita Ganatra | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Onslow | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Funnell | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
TESSA JANE DOUCH | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE SYMONDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.12k | £58.59k | £76.02k | £276.88k | £200.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.03k | £103.82k | £93.20k | £272.86k | £146.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF 30 FROM THIRD WORLD COUNTRIES AND IN PARTICULAR UGANDA IN THEIR OWN COUNTRY OR IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP THOSE PRACTICAL, BUSINESS AND ACADEMIC SKILLS WHICH MAY ASSIST THEM TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WELL-BEING AND THOSE OF THEIR COMPATRIOTS AND OTHERS.
Area of benefit
UGANDA AND UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATCHWORTH HEATH HOUSE
BATCHWORTH HEATH
RICKMANSWORTH
HERTFORDSHIRE
WD3 1QB
- Phone:
- 01923829008
- Email:
- sue.symonds1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window