CLIC SARGENT CANCER CARE FOR CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Lives vs Cancer (the working name of CLIC Sargent Cancer Care for Children) is there for children and young people with cancer and their families, responding to their individual needs and caring through treatment and beyond. We provide emotional,practical and financial support, and take what beneficiaries tell us about the impact of cancer on their lives to help change things for the better.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£23,069,000
Donations and legacies | £19.07m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £3.77m | |
Investments | £136.00k | |
Other | £92.00k |
Total expenditure:
£26,083,000
Raising funds | £11.85m | |
Charitable activities | £14.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.85m | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.24m |
People

353 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
1086 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 December 2004: Standard registration
- 13 November 2018: Funds received from 1149413 GOVINDBHAI FOUNDATION
- 09 February 2021: Funds received from 327270 THE OLIVE HERBERT CHARITABLE TRUST
- 04 August 2021: Funds received from 1174151 TOMMY MEAGERS' WARRIORS
- 11 May 2022: Funds received from 1053701 REDCOURT PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
- 15 November 2022: Funds received from 1039408 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF ST AUSTELL BENEVOLENT FUND
- 07 July 2023: Funds received from 1172985 FLETCHER'S FUND
- CLIC SARGENT (Working name)
- Young Lives vs Cancer (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir David Haslam | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Mphanza | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Baker | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kendrew | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Mills | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Kevin Ronald Smith | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Farag | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Blackmore | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farrah Kitabi | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hancock | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hollis | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.42m | £22.20m | £26.32m | £23.83m | £23.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.79m | £21.12m | £24.16m | £25.54m | £26.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.47m | £77.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £21.69m | £18.09m | £20.99m | £19.50m | £19.07m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.65m | £4.06m | £5.29m | £4.20m | £3.77m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £22.00k | £6.00k | £2.00k | £37.00k | £136.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.06m | £47.00k | £49.00k | £94.00k | £92.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £3.76m | £2.38m | £3.34m | £2.92m | £2.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.94m | £12.29m | £12.51m | £13.55m | £14.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.86m | £8.82m | £11.66m | £11.99m | £11.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £74.00k | £50.00k | £40.00k | £41.00k | £53.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.43m | £14.60m | £15.96m | £16.08m | £15.66m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £125.00k | |
|
Other assets | £15.33m | £16.61m | £18.15m | £15.60m | £12.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.77m | £3.13m | £3.87m | £3.15m | £3.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JUN 2020 as amended on 07 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF, CARE, WELL-BEING AND REHABILITATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AFFLICTED WITH ANY FORM OF CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES; 3.2 TO PROVIDE THERAPEUTIC AND RECUPERATIVE CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO ANY PERSON IN NEED THEREOF WHO RECEIVES OR HAS RECEIVED CARE OR ASSISTANCE OF ANY KIND FROM THE CHARITY WHILST A CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON OR WHO HAS BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER WHILST A CHILD OR A YOUNG PERSON AND TO PROVIDE CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO ANY SUCH PERSON'S IMMEDIATE FAMILY, BEING IN NEED; 3.3 TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND PUBLISH ANY USEFUL RESULTS INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF CANCER IN CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; 3.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
Whitefriars
Lewins Mead
BRISTOL
BS1 2NT
- Phone:
- 0300 330 0803
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window