SEEDBED CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
I. CHRISTIAN PROCLAMATION - PARTNERSHIPS WITH DIRECT CHRISTIAN PROCLAMATION, ON AN ENTIRELY NON-COERCIVE AND INVITATIONAL BASIS. II. CHRISTIAN SOCIAL ACTION - PARTNERSHIPS WITH THOSE WHO SHARE A CHRISTIAN PERSPECTIVE. III. KINGDOM MISSION - PARTNERSHIPS WITH THOSE NOT WORKING FROM A ACKNOWLEDGED CHRISTIAN PERSPECTIVE, BUT ENGAGED IN ONGOING CONVERSATION REGARDING THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 March 2005: Standard registration
- 16 June 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BRADFORD TWO28 (Working name)
- DREAMS AND VISIONS - NORWICH AND NORFOLK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.30m | £5.30m | £5.30m | £4.50m | £382 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43m | £5.97m | £6.04m | £6.90m | £3.98m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.30m | £5.30m | £5.30m | £4.50m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.20k | £829 | £228 | £370 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £50 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.41m | £5.92m | £6.04m | £6.90m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.05k | £12.40k | £12.40k | £3.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £353.75k | £50.00k | £100.00k | £144.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £117 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 June 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 27 September 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 25 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window