THE SOCIETY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANAESTHESIA IN DENTISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education, advice and research relating to dental sedation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£533,333
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £501.25k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £32.08k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£509,188
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £509.19k | |
Other | £0 |
-£10,045 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £509.19k | |
Retained for future use | £24.15k |
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 December 2004: Standard registration
- SAAD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yi Kwan Loo | Chair | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Martin Francis Kerr | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Chaplin-Rogers | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronan Gok Hung Lee | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laleh Sharifian | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie King Yee Fenesan | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imran Suida | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Stamp | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lees | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manni Deol | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Shehabi | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOWLETT | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SADIE HUGHES | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN BOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £592.18k | £220.52k | £276.55k | £417.01k | £533.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.26k | £228.02k | £290.19k | £390.29k | £509.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £566.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £501.25k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £20 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £298.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £509.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £130.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.93k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £21.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.34k | |
|
Long-term investments | £490.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £423.96k | |
|
Other assets | £504.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND EXTEND THE PRACTICE OF IMPROVED METHODS OF ADMINISTRATION OF ANAESTHESIA AND SEDATION AND ALL FORMS OF ANXIETY AND PAIN CONTROL IN DENTISTRY. (2) BY MEANS OF LECTURES, CLASSES, DEMONSTRATIONS, DISCUSSIONS, PUBLICATIONS OR OTHERWISE, TO IMPART TO AND DISSEMINATE AMONG DENTAL AND MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS, DENTAL AND MEDICAL NURSES, DENTAL HYGIENISTS, DENTAL THERAPISTS AND OTHER PROFESSIONS RELATED TO MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY A KNOWLEDGE OF THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF DENTAL ANAESTHESIA AND SEDATION AND ALL FORMS OF PAIN AND ANXIETY CONTROL IN DENTISTRY WITH A VIEW TO THE ENHANCEMENT THEREBY OF THE SAFETY AND WELLBEING OF THEIR PATIENTS. (3) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE CONDUCIVE TO THE OBJECTS AFORESAID..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
VINE COTTAGE
PINFOLD LANE
FISHLAKE
DONCASTER
DN7 5LA
- Phone:
- 01302846149
- Email:
- info@saad.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window