Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANAESTHESIA IN DENTISTRY
Charity number: 1107420

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yi Kwan Loo | Chair | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Martin Francis Kerr | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Chaplin-Rogers | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronan Gok Hung Lee | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laleh Sharifian | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie King Yee Fenesan | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imran Suida | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Stamp | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lees | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manni Deol | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Shehabi | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOWLETT | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|||||
SADIE HUGHES | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN BOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.