MULGRAVE COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sports facilities for the local community. To maintain these facilities which are the Sports Field and Pavilion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUGLAS ATKINSON RAINE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Robert Digweed | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TIMOTHY BAGSHAW | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES RAINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Neil Alan Duell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE MAY RAINE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.47k | £9.40k | £15.41k | £23.72k | £18.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.90k | £9.94k | £9.54k | £53.11k | £54.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND FURTHER COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE MULGRAVE WARD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE BENEFICIAL AREA") PRIMARILY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY ACQUIRING AND PROVIDING GROUNDS, FACILITIES AND PREMISES TO ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN TEAM GAMES AND SPORTS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BOWLS, CRICKET AND FOOTBALL AND BY ORGANISING OR PROVIDING COACHING AND TRAINING TO ENABLE ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO PLAY TEAM GAMES AND SPORTS 2. THE PROVISION OR ORGANISATION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OR ORGANISATION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED) OF THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES
Area of benefit
MULGRAVE WARD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROWAN HOUSE
2 POND FARM CLOSE
HINDERWELL
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS13 5HJ
- Phone:
- 01947840977
- Email:
- info@sportmulgrave.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window