RIF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1109701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal object of the charity is to promote such charitable purpose or purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time determine particularly but not exclusively to assist charities for the visually impaired.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £654
Total expenditure: £1,052

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT IAN FRANKL Chair
None on record
Adam Lee Caplan Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
IAN SLUCKIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £197 £385 £330 £288 £654
Total expenditure £3.29k £1.38k £1.90k £954 £1.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FREEDMAN FRANKL & TAYLOR
REEDHAM HOUSE
31 KING STREET WEST
MANCHESTER
M3 2PJ
Phone:
01618342574
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available