UNIQUE WAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work together with the families and carers of disabled children and young people to create positive change in their daily lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £101,619 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,691 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Calderdale
Governance
- 10 May 2005: Standard registration
- 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1163855 GROW BIG
- CPCC (Working name)
- CALDERDALE PARENTS AND CARERS (Previous name)
- THE CALDERDALE PARENT AND CARER'S COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Enright | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Poyser-Buxton | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Darby | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.58k | £240.33k | £150.47k | £177.82k | £130.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.86k | £148.41k | £187.35k | £182.99k | £170.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £98.62k | £101.62k | £101.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.91k | £109.69k | £13.95k | N/A | £2.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 APR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND SUPPORT TO CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND/OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEED, THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH ALL AGENCIES PROVIDING SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO SAID PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING SERVICES AND PROMOTING POSITIVE ACCESS, SOCIAL INCLUSION, PROTECTION AND WELLBEING OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unique Ways
Hanson Lane Enterprise Centre
Hanson Lane
Halifax
HX1 5PG
- Phone:
- 01422343090
- Email:
- hi@uniqueways.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window