Financial history WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT HOUSING LIMITED

Charity Number: 1107623
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £118.91m £131.83m £137.87m £148.36m £156.51m
Total expenditure £124.82m £119.33m £120.25m £129.35m £139.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £740.00k £745.16k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.12m £1.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.33m
Income - Other trading activities £3.12m £3.53m £4.28m £4.40m £4.37m
Income - Charitable activities £115.78m £128.29m £133.56m £143.84m £148.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.00k £14.00k £35.00k £126.00k £162.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £123.72m £116.57m £116.95m £125.88m £135.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.07m
Expenditure - Governance £38.00k £35.00k £37.00k £45.00k £118.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0