PENTECOSTAL CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church committee to reach out to the needy, the broken-hearted, the lonely and the depressed by showing them God's unconditional love and giving them a hope in Christ. We support the elderly, children, young people, the disabled and prisoners financially and emotionally both in the UK and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 07 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLALEKE IBUKUNOLUWA ALABI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GENEVIEVE SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.27k | £10.39k | £10.75k | £8.59k | £8.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.66k | £8.17k | £10.66k | £8.96k | £9.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION LOCALLY BY SPREADING THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST THROUGH EVANGELISM, WINNING SOULS AND DISCIPLING THEM REACHING OUT TO THE DISADVANTAGED IN THE COMMUNITY HOLDING REGULAR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES MINISTERING GOD'S HEALING TO THE SICK AND HELPING TO SET SPIRITUAL CAPTIVES FREE COUNSELLING AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE FOR THOSE IN NEED OF COUNSELLING SUPPORTING WORLD MISSIONS, MISSIONS AGENCIES, MISSIONARIES AND MISSION PROJECTS WORLDWIDE PERFORMING ANY OTHER FUNCTIONS THAT ARE ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 OAK RIDGE
DORKING
RH4 2NY
- Phone:
- 01306640897
- Email:
- pccdorking@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window