Financial history SOLENT YOUTH ACTION

Charity number: 1108361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £115.55k £102.90k £80.27k £91.96k £101.09k
Total expenditure £91.39k £89.10k £89.67k £103.95k £97.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.38k £22.52k £24.08k £15.56k £18.99k