THE COLLINGWOOD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation brings together staff, students, parents, members of the community and grant providers with the joint vision of enhancing the education and life experiences of the students from Collingwood School & Media Arts College. It also provides opportunities for family learning and activities for students from the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 16 February 2005: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF COLLINGWOOD SCHOOL MORPETH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Cosgrove | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brooke Burgess | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Routledge | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
iain Armstrong Katz | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Nicholson | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kallie Smith | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Major | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Walker | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Wilkinson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Halliwell | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Straker | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Linkleter | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ASKEW | Trustee | 21 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.39k | £37.21k | £39.95k | £15.87k | £15.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.85k | £52.26k | £37.06k | £18.23k | £21.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 18/01/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLLINGWOOD SCHOOL AND MEDIA ARTS
STOBHILLGATE
MORPETH
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE61 2HA
- Phone:
- 01670516374
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window