WHITE PIGEON LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To contibute to and quality of life and help people and alleviate suffering throughout the the region of Sri Lanka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 04 January 2005: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WHITE PIGEON (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455.39k | £157.34k | £224.87k | £145.05k | £20.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £401.79k | £260.27k | £160.39k | £137.91k | £33.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF LAND MINE VICTIMS INCLUDING EDUCATION AND PROSTHETICS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LAND MINE AWARENESS. 3. THE RELIEF OF NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY ( OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANIZATIONS IN SRI LANKA INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICINES.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window