WATLING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hiring halls for various activities: children's nursery, dance groups, martial arts, yoga etc & weekend parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANISH SHAH | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Khamir Jang Gurung | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sangita Pandya | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Folakemi Kuti | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Wagstaff | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodolfo Orellana | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY JOURNET | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
HASMUKH HARIA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.93k | £96.71k | £240.70k | £173.76k | £176.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.55k | £179.66k | £118.97k | £109.16k | £123.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £104.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.18k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WATLING ESTATE AND SURROUNDING AREAS (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND 2. TO ESTABLISH, OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WATLING ESTATE AND SURROUNDING AREAS, EDGWARE, MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Watling Centre
145 Orange Hill Road
EDGWARE
HA8 0TR
- Phone:
- 02089592259
- Email:
- watlingcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window