HIGHFIELD CARNIVAL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2005: Standard registration
- 24 July 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 3 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING EXCLUDED FROM SCHOOL OR AT RISK OF OFFENDING BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN CARNIVAL ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SEWING, PATTERN CUTTING AND INTERIOR DESIGN. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE RESIDING IN HEMEL HEMPSTEAD IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window