Accounts and annual returns WICKED FISH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1108661
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On Time