Governing document CENTRAL WALSALL HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 30 OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 2001, 23 JANUARY 2003 AND 21 MARCH 2005 EFFECTIVE FROM 01 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO CARRY OUT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY:- (A) THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR POOR PEOPLE AND FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WALSALL, WEST MIDLANDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.