CHRISTIAN SCIENCE COMMITTEE FOR "FOCUS"

Charity number: 1108429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE COMMITTEE IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPLICATION OF THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE RELIGION BY THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE & THE PROVISION OF OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH FOSTER AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AN AWARENESS & AN APPRECIATION OF THE VALUES & TEACHINGS OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE & WHICH ENCOURAGE THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION THEREOF AND SUCH OTHER APPROPRIATE ACTIVITIES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £81,372
Total expenditure: £94,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 2005: Standard registration
  • 15 September 2021: Funds received from 1027429 FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST SCIENTIST TUNBRIDGE WELLS
  • 17 September 2024: Funds received from 243690 CHARITY FOR THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, WAKEFIE...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOCUS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen de Leon Chair 29 November 2022
None on record
Rebecca Kent Trustee 29 November 2022
LONDON ORIANA CHOIR LIMITED
Received: On time
Margaret McElfresh Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Edwin de Leon Trustee 02 December 2019
CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, HIGH WYCOMBE AND MAIDENHEAD
Received: On time
Tricia Rickard Trustee 20 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.55k £41.42k £13.83k £170.63k £81.37k
Total expenditure £57.34k £8.75k £8.97k £187.64k £94.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 July 2024 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 July 2024 271 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tythe Barn
Bassetsbury Lane
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 1QX
Phone:
07740125947