Financial history THE HONEYSUCKLE CENTRE

Charity number: 1109164
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £71.86k £68.25k £68.25k £72.56k £23.27k
Total expenditure £64.39k £70.35k £70.35k £65.51k £28.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £17.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £62.11k £0