NUZHAT ZAKI CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL AND WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1110735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary objects of the Trust are towards the advancement of education, the relief of sickness and the relief of poverty, hardship and distress in India or elsewhere throughout the world by such exclusively charitable means as the trustees shall from time to time determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,891
Total expenditure: £18,689

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAANISH AMAN ZAKI Trustee 26 July 2023
None on record
Dr NAZURA KHAN Trustee
None on record
Dr NUZHAT NASREEN ZAKI Trustee
None on record
Dr MOHAMMED ZAKI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.83k £22.45k £26.43k £25.60k £29.89k
Total expenditure £7.80k £12.12k £8.89k £6.96k £18.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 February 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 February 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pax Hill
Bentley
Farnham
Surrey
GU10 5NG
Phone:
01420525880
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available