AQUARIUS COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AQUARIUS COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED RUNS A COMMUNITY CENTRE (AND ITS STAFF) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF HULME AND ITS ENVIRONS, PROVIDING A COMMUNITY RESOURCE FOR COMMUNITY, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL, AND HEALTH & WELL-BEING ACTIVITIES. ACC HAS A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON WORK WITH SCHOOL-AGE CHILDREN AND YOUTH, PROVIDING AN ESSENTIAL SERVICE IN A HIGH-SCORING, MULTI-DREPRAVATION AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £76,624 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 14 January 2005: Standard registration
- 15 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AQUARIUS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.22k | £86.52k | £76.81k | £69.03k | £78.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.91k | £83.07k | £77.61k | £83.25k | £104.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HULME AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN A COMMUNITY CENTRE ('THE CENTRE') (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. 3.3 PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
HULME, MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window