MYWAYS TRAINING LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- MYWAYS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.51k | £96.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.04k | £84.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 13 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 15 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 03 August 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THE NECESSARY SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO SECURE EMPLOYMENT (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF EMPLOYERS AND THE WIDER GENERAL PUBLIC BY RAISING AWARENESS OF DISABILITY ISSUES IN ORDER TO BREAK DOWN SOCIETAL BARRIERS TO EMPLOYMENT AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT IS THE NORTH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
THE NORTH OF ENGLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window