Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF LYDIARD PARK

Charity Number: 1107635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 February 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 March 2022 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required