BARROW HEDGES PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils in the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sutton
Governance
- 18 January 2005: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2011: Re-registered
- BARROW HEDGES PTA (Working name)
- BARROW HEDGES PTFA (Working name)
- BARROW HEDGES PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard OBrien | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Payal Mishra | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Richards | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Vaughan | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Edgson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monica Leroen | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Duffy | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Bickell | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Welch | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Fleming | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Holly Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Alcourt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £1.96k | £10.01k | £32.14k | £37.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.90k | £16.16k | £7.32k | £19.76k | £37.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 20 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CARSHALTON, GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARROW HEDGES SCHOOL
HARBURY ROAD
CARSHALTON
SM5 4LA
- Phone:
- 02086434428
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window