Accounts and annual returns KETTERING MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1108873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 February 2025 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 February 2025 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 February 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 February 2024 118 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 May 2022 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 May 2022 197 days late Download Open in new window