RURAL COMMUNITY SUPPORT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a wide range of information to local residents and visitors to the area. This range includes tourist information, bus and train timetables, details of local activities, hotels and B&Bs, also local authority information and Government leaflets concerning welfare issues and benefits. Up-to-date computing services can now be accessed by visitors to the Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 12 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Harrison | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
SALLY JANE DICKINSON | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Sheila Charlton | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE COGDELL | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.28k | £9.90k | £18.92k | £10.26k | £9.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £5.43k | £7.64k | £10.06k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | £900 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF HERSTMONCEUX AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION THAT WILL IMPROVE THE WELFARE OF SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAID PURPOSE AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF STATUTORY BODIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER AGENCIES ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO SHARE BEST PRACTICE.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF HERSTMONCEUX AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rural Community Support Society
2/3 The Old Forge
Gardner Street,Herstmonceux
HAILSHAM
East Sussex
BN27 4LG
- Phone:
- 07716 308304
- Email:
- herstmonceuxvic@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window