Accounts and annual returns THE THEBES PROJECT

Charity number: 1108501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 February 2025 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 February 2025 463 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 March 2023 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 March 2021 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required