CHIPS GUILDFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of CHIPS GUILDFORD are to provide and promote quality holiday play provision for children whose parents need help and assistance, and to establish a safe, fun and stimulating play environment with a varied program of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 May 2005: Standard registration
- 26 May 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1189799 CHIPS GUILDFORD
- CHIPS GUILDFORD (Working name)
- CHIPS (CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY PLAYSCHEME) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.68k | £38.69k | £64.03k | £49.92k | £51.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.79k | £34.89k | £46.71k | £45.90k | £50.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.42k | £20.70k | £19.07k | £10.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2019
(These accounts |
30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 30 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 30 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 18 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 18 July 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 4 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND CARE FOR CHILDREN DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS THROUGH PLAY AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WEYFIELD SCHOOL. GUILDFORD GROVE SCHOOL AND WESTBOROUGH SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window