ANJUMAN WAZIFA SADATT-WA-MOMINEEN OF UNITED KINGDOM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are waiting for the change from UK only to all over the world. We have spent 100's of hours discussing the direction of this charity. It will be operational once we have your consent to our request.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 May 2005: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 September 2011: Re-registered
- 15 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 15 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1201458 HUSSAINI ISLAMIC TRUST UK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £562 | £507 | £476 | £445 | £429 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN THE SHIA COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window