THE MANCHESTER DEAF CENTRE

Charity number: 1110373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We promote services to enable deaf, hard-of-hearing and deafblind people to improve the quality of their lives. The Deaf Centre provides facilities for Sports & Social Club, Deafblind, Youth Group and 50 Group. All groups are supported through training and volunteer project we have. We run an agency which provides Sign Language Interpreters. We also provide BSL and Deaf Awareness training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MANCHESTER DEAF CENTRE (Working name)
  • MDC (Working name)
  • THE MANCHESTER DEAF CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Lisa Cummings Chair 07 August 2024
None on record
Kailey Mills Trustee 07 March 2025
None on record
Sarah Powell Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Tina Kirwin Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Christopher Coles Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Bryony Claire Parkes Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Christos Argyropoulos Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Alistair Wright Trustee 11 February 2017
None on record
Shelley Lanchbury Trustee 19 January 2016
None on record
Brian Kokoruwe Trustee 11 November 2015
None on record
Pauline Roberts Trustee 16 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £459.29k £893.70k £679.48k £839.76k £703.02k
Total expenditure £463.29k £596.98k £930.36k £753.68k £1.04m
Income from government contracts £15.00k £90.00k £84.52k £101.94k £81.66k
Income from government grants £55.00k £38.33k £96.39k £205.26k £104.78k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £154.65k £11.45k £3.15k £7.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £41.84k £46.31k £57.18k £54.06k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £696.96k £619.74k £779.17k £639.54k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £248 £1.99k £256 £2.14k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £150.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £591.36k £921.60k £748.73k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £5.62k £8.76k £4.95k £7.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.70k £0 £0 £7.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £633.30k £607.55k £333.25k £328.00k
Long-term investments N/A £71.40k £13.77k £0 £0
Other assets N/A £459.14k £262.37k £344.32k £189.87k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 £0 -£232.88k
Total liabilities N/A £208.63k £173.67k £140.10k £91.13k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Crawford House
Booth Street East
Manchester
Lancashire
M13 9GH
Phone:
01612733415