THE WELL AT WILLEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to support aims of charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 23 June 2005: Standard registration
- 27 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.87k | £5.55k | £1.92k | £1.19k | £365 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £4.05k | £10.10k | £5.48k | £65 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 23 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 07 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 21 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROVIDE FOR THE WELL-BEING AND SPIRITUAL CARE OF THE TERMINALLY ILL AND FOR ANYONE BEING CARED FOR AT WILLEN HOSPICE OR IN THE COMMUNITY,THROUGH THE CHRISTIAN HEALING OF THE CHURCH, TOGETHER WITH CARE AND SUPPORT OFFERED BY OTHER FAITHS, IN CONJUNCTION WITH MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS AT ALL LEVELS, AND TO SIMULATE INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window