NEW MILL MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development of music in our home area through concerts and related activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 20 January 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Joseph | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Petrie | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
John Christopher Dempster | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Morgan | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Flynn | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Anthony Seymour Sims | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Holman | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MALLINSON | Trustee | 14 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVE DAVIES | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.53k | £26.78k | £11.99k | £40.15k | £36.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.55k | £29.98k | £11.11k | £37.94k | £37.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE AND TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Kirkbridge Lane
New Mill
HOLMFIRTH
HD9 7LG
- Phone:
- 07875257942
- Email:
- info@newmillmvc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window