THE ARTS UNIVERSITY BOURNEMOUTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provision of educational services for the students at the Arts University Bournemouth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 May 2005: Standard registration
- THE ARTS INSTITUTE AT BOURNEMOUTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE ARTS UNIVERSITY COLLEGE AT BOURNEMOUTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Ann Irwin | Chair | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul James Gough | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Mann | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Kinvig | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Mackenzie | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.00k | £60.00k | £43.00k | £27.44k | £18.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.00k | £36.00k | £27.00k | £26.09k | £27.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 October 2020 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26/03/2013 as amended on 18 Jun 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2019 as amended on 02 Dec 2022 as amended on 16 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY FOR STUDENTS AT THE ARTS UNIVERSITY BOURNEMOUTH WITHIN THE SUBJECT AREAS OF ART, DESIGN, MEDIA AND PERFORMANCE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 3.1.1 CONTRIBUTING TO THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AT THE UNIVERSITY (INCLUDING WHERE APPROPRIATE THE PROVISION OF MATERIALS TO SUPPORT LEARNING); 3.1.2 PROVIDING ACADEMIC TRAVEL OR EXCHANGE BURSARIES FOR STUDENTS UNDERTAKING A SUBJECT-SPECIFIC, STUDY FOCUSED EXPERIENCE OVERSEAS WHICH THE AUB TRUSTEES BELIEVE WILL OFFER SIGNIFICANT BENEFITS TO THE INDIVIDUAL, IN TERMS OF THEIR ACADEMIC AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, AND WHICH HAS THE POTENTIAL TO ENHANCE THE INTERNATIONAL REPUTATION OF THE UNIVERSITY, AND/OR COURSE. 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND PROMOTE THE APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING AN OPERATING A CULTURAL VENUE AT BOURNEMOUTH (BH1).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arts University Bournemouth
7 Fern Barrow
Wallisdown
Poole
Dorset
BH12 5HH
- Phone:
- 01202363213
- Email:
- general@aub.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window