FUTURE TALENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Future Talent provides critical support to enable gifted musical talent to flourish. We find, fund, nurture and monitor gifted musicians aged between 5 and 18 whose current financial circumstances are preventing them from fulfilling their musical potential. The funding and opportunities we provide enable young people from across the UK to aim high and make their musical dreams a reality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 January 2005: Standard registration
- 09 December 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 09 December 2021: Funds transferred to 1183804 FUTURE TALENT MUSICIANS
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.87k | £229.74k | £72.98k | £419.08k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.22k | £224.73k | £228.86k | £297.41k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 October 2021 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE SPECIALIST MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH: (1) THE FUNDING OF MUSICAL RESOURCES IN SCHOOLS INCLUDING SPECIALIST TEACHERS AND INSTRUMENTS; (2) ARRANGING AND FUNDING PRIVATE MUSICAL TUITION, VISITS TO MUSICAL PERFORMANCES AND VISITS TO SPECIALIST SCHOOLS; AND (3) ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window