Financial history MANACARE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1108701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.80k £24.40k £23.29k £23.70k £38.40k
Total expenditure £33.80k £23.51k £15.26k £21.81k £36.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A