Accounts and annual returns PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF ST LAURENCE JUNIOR SCHOOL RAMSGATE

Charity number: 1109652
Charity reporting is overdue by 1747 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 652 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 652 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1017 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1017 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1382 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1382 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1747 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1747 days