Financial history MEON VALLEY CARERS GROUP

Charity number: 1107865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.66k £163 £122 £505 £1.81k
Total expenditure £2.87k £1.18k £775 £1.21k £893
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A